Accounts and annual returns FEDERAL GOVERNMENT COLLEGE ENUGU OLD STUDENTS ALUMNI UK & EUROPE LIMITED

Charity number: 1172816
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 December 2019 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 April 2019 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 07 April 2019 158 days late