Trustees COLCHESTER ISLAMIC COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity number: 1175376
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SOHAIL CHOKSY | Chair | 14 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hooria Ahmad | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kiran Zahra Syed | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fowad Murtaza | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kazeem Oloyede | Trustee | 31 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Ray Barakat | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr MUHAMMAD FAROOQ SIDDIQUE | Trustee | 14 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMED NADIM | Trustee | 14 January 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.