Trustees THE GOLDSMITHS' CRAFT AND DESIGN COUNCIL
Charity number: 1172110

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathryn Ruth Bishop | Trustee | 25 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judith Lockwood | Trustee | 21 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maeve Gillies | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Ball | Trustee | 08 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robin Stephen Kyte | Trustee | 06 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MARIE REEVES | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
PETER CLEMENT CRUMP | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN PUTLAND | Trustee | 11 February 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.