Accounts and annual returns HUNGARIAN CLUB AND SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1173258
Charity reporting is up to date (131 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 August 2023 08 November 2024 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2023 08 November 2024 131 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 August 2022 05 August 2024 402 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2022 05 August 2024 402 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 August 2021 03 August 2024 765 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2021 03 August 2024 765 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 August 2020 02 July 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2020 02 July 2021 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 August 2019 05 August 2020 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2019 06 August 2020 37 days late Download Open in new window