Financial history LONGMYND ADVENTURE CAMP

Charity number: 1173783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £33.55k £15.66k £19.51k £33.03k £55.79k
Total expenditure £21.83k £20.28k £13.42k £23.01k £29.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.33k £16.10k £2.67k N/A