Accounts and annual returns THE DROP IN AND SHARE CENTRE (DISC) NEWQUAY

Charity number: 1171562
Charity reporting is overdue by 123 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 123 days
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 123 days
Annual return 28 February 2023 29 December 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 29 December 2023 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 23 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 23 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 14 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 14 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 06 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 06 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window