EREWASH CANAL PRESERVATION AND DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association works closely with Canal & River Trust and holds weekly work parties to assist with the on-going maintenance and upkeep of the Erewash canal. ECP&DA also owns and maintains Sandiacre Lock cottages, opening them to the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 06 July 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Margaret Swain | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Stenson | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Wendy Kilbourne | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Martin | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MICHAEL KING | Trustee | 17 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
GLYN ANTHONY STENSON | Trustee | 17 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.21k | £25.26k | £16.09k | £20.86k | £43.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.40k | £27.22k | £33.70k | £27.42k | £39.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £1.42k | £500 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE RESTORATION, RECONSTRUCTION, PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE EREWASH CANAL AND ASSOCIATED WATERWAYS. ITS BUILDINGS, TOWING PATH, STRUCTURES AND CRAFT AND THE CONSERVATION OF ITS NATURAL CHARACTER AS A NAVIGABLE INLAND WATERWAY SYSTEM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. TO PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL AND TRAINING FACILITIES TO MEMBERS AND THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF CANALS, THROUGH THE HERITAGE OF THE BUILT AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, AND EMPHASISE THE IMPORTANCE OF SAFETY REQUIREMENTS IN A WATERWAY ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
130 Derby Road
Langley Mill
NOTTINGHAM
NG16 4AA
- Phone:
- 07809 251441
- Email:
- glynstenson@hotmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window