Financial history BILTON HALL COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1171907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £162.04k £133.26k £153.39k £163.52k £166.60k
Total expenditure £140.36k £89.50k £198.69k £164.14k £147.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A