THE KAMINI AND VINDI BANGA FAMILY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary area of focus is cancer research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income:
£1,216,956
Donations and legacies | £950.00k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £29.46k | |
Other | £237.50k |
Total expenditure:
£180,539
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £180.54k | |
Other | £0 |
£897,783 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £167,510 from 6 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £180.54k | |
Retained for future use | £1.04m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £180.54k | |
Retained for future use | £1.93m |
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 February 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lord Jitesh Gadhia | Trustee | 02 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Roy Malcolm Anderson | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
MANVINDER BANGA | Trustee | 26 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kamini Banga | Trustee | 26 January 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.01k | £230.23k | £1.26m | £1.21m | £1.22m | |
|
Total expenditure | £224.64k | £165.05k | £317.23k | £173.35k | £180.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £167.51k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £1.00m | £950.00k | £950.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £1.00m | £0 | £950.00k | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £10.62k | £23.83k | £29.46k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £250.00k | £237.50k | £237.50k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £317.23k | £161.68k | £180.54k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £13.03k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £167.51k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £11.67k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | £5.55m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £7.02m | £8.71m | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | £1.14m | £511.33k | £752.05k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | £14.10k | £24.10k | £23.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 13 March 2024 | 402 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 13 March 2024 | 402 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME HELD BY THE TRUST TO OR TOWARDS OR FOR THE BENEFIT OR FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS (WHETHER CORPORATE OR UNINCORPORATED) AT SUCH TIME, IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 ILCHESTER PLACE
LONDON
W14 8AA
- Phone:
- 01892701801
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window