FRIENDS OF SALISBURY MEDICAL PRACTICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide the relief of sickness, disease or human suffering as well as the promotion of health for the patients of The Salisbury Medical Practice and for the public benefit of people residing or working in the general area of Salisbury, in particular but not exclusively, by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities, support services, equipment, training and education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 02 May 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Polly Jacobs | Chair | 13 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Bottjer | Trustee | 13 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Davidson | Trustee | 13 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
RUTH CROXALL | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
GRAEME ROTHWELL MBE | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.05k | £1.97k | £334 | £2.58k | £3.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.23k | £7.84k | £997 | £1.67k | £1.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 02 May 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, DISEASE OR HUMAN SUFFERING AS WELL AS THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH FOR THE PATIENTS OF THE SALISBURY MEDICAL PRACTICE AND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PEOPLE RESIDING OR WORKING IN THE GENERAL AREA OF SALISBURY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES, EQUIPMENT, TRAINING AND EDUCATION, NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE DOCTORS OR THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FISHERTON HOUSE
FOUNTAIN WAY
WILTON ROAD
SALISBURY
WILTSHIRE
SP2 7FD
- Phone:
- 01722333034
- Email:
- bswicb.smp.friends@nhs.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window