FLO CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Flo Charitable Trust has been set up to ensure the provision of an Indoor Skatepark facility for the East Midlands area. In addition the wider culture around skateboarding and BMX will be encouraged through arts, music, mentoring and education provision. The charity will look to widen participation in these pastimes while more broadly supporting the development of young people in society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 16 March 2017: CIO registration
- FLO (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK ANTHONY DEANS | Chair | 16 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Caroline Frances Paechter | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Eyre | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Nelson | Trustee | 20 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Wright | Trustee | 20 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/10/2019 | 01/10/2020 | 01/10/2021 | 01/10/2022 | 01/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.98k | £85.12k | £91.45k | £94.43k | £83.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.58k | £79.87k | £79.00k | £114.01k | £88.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £55.41k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2023 | 31 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2022 | 01 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2022 | 01 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2020 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2020 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 October 2019 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2019 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SKATEBOARDING AND OTHER SIMILAR WHEELED SPORTS INCLUDING BMX. 2. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 3. TO ADVANCE THE ARTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOP AND PERFORMANCE SPACE FOR MUSIC, MEDIA, ART, PHOTOGRAPHY AND OTHER ART FORMS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flo Skate Park
5 Poulton Drive
NOTTINGHAM
NG2 4BN
- Phone:
- 07863 130300
- Email:
- mark@floskatepark.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window