Trustees NFU ESSEX CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1172540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NICHOLAS WILLIAM REED Chair 11 April 2017
None on record
Matthew Peter Unwin Trustee 23 March 2023
None on record
CAROLE BUTLER Trustee 01 December 2020
None on record
Nicholas James Percival Trustee 11 November 2019
None on record
Christopher Barr Trustee 01 November 2018
None on record
CHARLES COURTENAY TRITTON Trustee 11 April 2017
THE PAUL TRITTON TRUST
Received: On time
J M CHARITABLE TRUST
Recently registered