Accounts and annual returns THE ROYAL SUTTON COLDFIELD ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 509630
Charity reporting is up to date (175 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 April 2025 175 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 06 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 March 2022 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 December 2020 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required