Financial history LYMM RFC LIMITED

Charity number: 1172259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £205.00k £240.19k £193.09k £194.21k £788.33k
Total expenditure £168.49k £134.16k £197.64k £247.67k £401.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £40.42k £79.05k £950 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £629.90k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £119.15k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £39.28k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £401.97k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £9.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0