Sound Vision CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We empower individuals and communities through personal development, education, creativity and communications. Through training, we offer solutions to a lack of opportunities, loneliness, isolation, and regional disparity. Our skills-based learning programmes are inclusive, supporting neurodiversity, learning disabilities, mental health challenges and those seeking employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 10 May 2017: CIO registration
- Sound Vision (Working name)
- SOMER VALLEY EDUCATION TRUST CIO (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nick Bull | Trustee | 21 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Martha Chambers | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Philip John GIBBONS | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Felicity Stride | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS WATT | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MRS ANNIE MAW | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.79k | £85.62k | £118.14k | £103.58k | £115.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.76k | £64.90k | £89.51k | £110.53k | £112.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 October 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 May 2017 as amended on 25 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN THE SKILLS REQUIRED FOR MEDIA BROADCASTING AND COMMUNICATION; AND (2) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sound Vision Charity
The Old Surgery
St. Chads Avenue
Midsomer Norton
RADSTOCK
BA3 2HG
- Phone:
- 01761 411222
- Email:
- info@soundvision.charity
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window