THE COUNTY ALDERMAN WORSLEY JP SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants fro the purpose of assisting students with their educational costs
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 12 January 1981: Standard registration
- 25 October 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 25 October 2011: Funds transferred to 1111222-2 THE SPECK WALKER FUND
- THE ALDERMAN WORSLEY (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.71k | £4.07k | £5.37k | £3.57k | £1.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.76k | £2.04k | £2.20k | £3.17k | £1.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 04 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 15 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 31 July 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 12/01/1983 AS AFFECTED BY RESOLUTION MADE UNDER S74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 28/10/2010
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN AWARDING TO PERSONS RESIDENT IN THORNABY ON TEES SCHOLARSHIP TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, POLYTECHNIC OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER OR HIGHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL) EDUCATION APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEE: PREFERANCE SHALL BE GIVEN TO PERSONS WHO ATTEND OR HAVE ATTENDED EVENING CLASSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE THORNABY-ON-TEES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window