WISBECH THEATRE TRUST

Charity Number: 1173321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the arts for the public benefit in Fenland and the surrounding areas by the provision of a theatre, currently known as the Angles Theatre, Alexandra Road, Wisbech (?the theatre?)

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £117,564
Total expenditure: £132,477

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire
  • Lincolnshire
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 June 2017: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • THE ANGLES THEATRE (Working name)
  • THE WISBECH THEATRE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joshua Samuel Shippey Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Joseph Connolly Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Louise Karalyn O'Connor Trustee 01 July 2022
None on record
Angela Nixon Trustee 11 September 2019
WISBECH ANGLES THEATRE COUNCIL
Received: On time
Robert Malcolm James Williams Trustee 23 May 2019
WISBECH ROUND TABLE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
WISBECH ANGLES THEATRE COUNCIL
Received: On time
Aidan James Cooper Trustee 23 May 2019
None on record
Mr M K Peploe Trustee 02 January 2018
WISBECH ANGLES THEATRE COUNCIL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £120.75k £184.61k £153.28k £107.49k £117.56k
Total expenditure £114.77k £156.04k £137.48k £134.31k £132.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £149.71k £30.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 27 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE ANGLES THEATRE
ALEXANDRA ROAD
WISBECH
PE13 1HQ
Phone:
01945474447