SHOTS IN THE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CIO ARE: (A) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH ('FACILITIES' IN THIS CLAUSE MEANS LAND BUILDING EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); (B) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATI
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bracknell Forest
- Hampshire
- Surrey
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 04 April 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Casey | Chair | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Adams | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Jacqui Vosper | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Kay Khan | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Keith Dibble | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Terry Owens | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Marcus | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
SHAHID AZEEM | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £178.11k | £184.35k | £182.36k | £31.43k | £65.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £140.90k | £205.73k | £192.24k | £25.97k | £48.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.86k | £19.10k | N/A | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 May 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 09 May 2023 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CIO ARE: (A) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH ('FACILITIES' IN THIS CLAUSE MEANS LAND BUILDING EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); (B) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY; AND (D) FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN EACH CASE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Aldershot Town Football Club
Recreation Ground
High Street
ALDERSHOT
Hampshire
GU11 1TW
- Phone:
- 01252 320211
- Email:
- admin@shotsfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window