ART REGENERATION AND COMMUNITY HERITAGE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF LINCOLNSHIRE AND HUMBER IN PARTICULAR THE NEIGHBOURHOOD OF IMMINGHAM, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 17 March 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEFAN LEON ALLAN | Chair | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Shauna Elliott | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Lorraine Gaughan | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen North | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
David John Gilliatt | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Aaron Watson | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neil Charles Turner | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|||||
David Aaron Watson | Trustee | 15 August 2018 |
|
|||||
ALAN BURLEY | Trustee | 06 February 2017 |
|
|||||
LYNNE WATSON | Trustee | 11 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.00k | £57.74k | £10.56k | £28.92k | £23.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.59k | £17.46k | £18.89k | £17.06k | £32.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £36.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 APR 2016
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF LINCOLNSHIRE AND HUMBER IN PARTICULAR THE NEIGHBOURHOOD OF IMMINGHAM, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS. THROUGH UNITING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE COMMUNITY FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE; FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND PROVISION OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF THE RESIDENTS AND THOSE PERSONS THAT HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES DUE TO YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. TO ESTABLISH AND SECURE A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN, MANAGE AND CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Carver Road
IMMINGHAM
DN40 1DS
- Phone:
- 01469515398
- Email:
- bert.boyden@virginmedia.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window