GLOUCESTERSHIRE & WORCESTERSHIRE 4X4 RESPONSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the CIO is to preserve and protect life and property, in particular but not exclusively, by providing equipment, vehicles and other resources to offer support in adverse conditions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 April 2017: CIO registration
- 28 September 2019: Funds received from 1127785 GLOUCESTERSHIRE 4X4 RESPONSE
- GW4X4R (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doug Oliver | Chair | 23 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Davies | Trustee | 23 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Morgan | Trustee | 23 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Hayward-Wright | Trustee | 31 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.98k | £5.49k | £7.36k | £15.20k | £13.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.85k | £13.25k | £6.34k | £6.43k | £8.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 16 August 2024 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 12 June 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 12 June 2020 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 11 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT LIFE AND PROPERTY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING EQUIPMENT, VEHICLES AND OTHER RESOURCES TO OFFER SUPPORT IN ADVERSE CONDITIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Hayward Wright Ltd
4 Clews Road
REDDITCH
Worcestershire
B98 7ST
- Phone:
- 0152769321
- Email:
- chair@gw4x4r.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window