Accounts and annual returns FINNBAR'S FORCE

Charity number: 1171958
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 April 2022 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 April 2022 437 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 April 2022 437 days late