THE HINRICHSEN FOUNDATION CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants to assist the public performance of contemporary music. Support for independent musicological research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 31 January 2017: CIO registration
- 05 January 2024: Funds received from 272389 THE HINRICHSEN FOUNDATION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIM BERG | Chair | 11 February 1999 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gavin Higgins | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Christian Rafael McMillan Mason | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bobbie-Jane Gardner | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr EDWARD MCKEON | Trustee | 16 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mark Bromley | Trustee | 16 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
TABBY ESTELL | Trustee | 02 July 2002 |
|
|
||||
Dr LINDA HIRST | Trustee | 22 April 1997 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR MICHAEL STEPHEN WALSH | Trustee | 06 July 1989 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £29.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £55.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION, AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE APPRECIATION, OF MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION OF THE COMPOSTION, PERFORMANCE AND RECORDING OF MUSIC; AND 3.2 THE RELIEF OF MUSICIANS AND EMPLOYEES AND EX-EMPLOYEES OF MUSIC PUBLISHING ENTITIES AND THEIR WIDOWS, WIDOWERS AND CHILDREN, WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
One Friar Street
Reading
- Phone:
- 07737228006
- Website:
-
hinrichsenfoundation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window