Trustees FRIENDS OF HUNTINGTREE PARK

Charity number: 1172700
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALAN HACKETT Chair 02 November 2011
None on record
Kevin Brian Halliday Trustee 25 March 2024
None on record
Alison McPhail Wootten Trustee 21 August 2022
None on record
SUSAN MARY KIRK Trustee 20 March 2017
None on record
CAROL ANN MATTHEWS Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
JANE LOUISE MATTHEWS Trustee 18 October 2013
None on record
LINDA MARY MCLENNAGHAN Trustee 02 November 2011
None on record
CHRISTINE MATTHEWS Trustee 02 November 2011
None on record