230TH SHEFFIELD (GLEADLESS) SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 509655
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide activities and support for young people in the Scouting movement in the Gleadless area of Sheffield.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £49,315
Total expenditure: £52,932

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 February 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Louise Flint Chair 21 September 2020
None on record
Rebbeca Young Trustee 26 September 2024
None on record
Niamh McGreal Trustee 26 September 2024
None on record
Nicol Maria Bradshaw Trustee 21 September 2020
None on record
Samantha Parsons Trustee 23 September 2019
None on record
Andrew Bradshaw Trustee 21 September 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £33.73k £31.04k £69.02k £32.32k £49.32k
Total expenditure £31.01k £10.00k £63.20k £44.23k £52.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £21.79k £46.66k N/A £389

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 07 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
32A Church Street
Eckington
SHEFFIELD
S21 4BH
Phone:
07832700623
Website:

No information available