Financial history CHANGE THROUGH EDUCATION IN AFRICA

Charity number: 1172971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £21.23k £36.98k £27.99k £50.58k £30.69k
Total expenditure £20.87k £27.06k £37.79k £50.03k £31.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A