MID SUSSEX RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assisted horse riding for adults with disabilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 01 February 2017: CIO registration
- 04 November 2017: Funds received from 1073736 MID SUSSEX RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Pugh | Chair | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chrissie Novelle | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Fiedosiuk | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth King | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Hornsby | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Franklin | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iona Brown | Trustee | 04 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE DOMBROWSKI | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE COOKE | Trustee | 17 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
RUBY GRIMSHAW | Trustee | 02 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.27k | £3.30k | £16.89k | £36.11k | £11.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.44k | £5.19k | £15.97k | £15.35k | £16.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 May 2024 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 May 2024 | 120 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CIO IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("RDA") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL- BEING IN THE MID SUSSEX AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Penshurst
Fox Hill Village
HAYWARDS HEATH
West Sussex
RH16 4QZ
- Phone:
- 07818034143
- Email:
- midsussexrda@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window