CASS & FRIENDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve need and promote health for young people between the ages of 12 and 18 years, living in Gloucestershire and Worcestershire, who cannot adequately access and participate in sport through lack of funding, by providing them with financial support for the acquisition of essential sporting equipment and coaching and to provide them with mentoring support where necessary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 18 September 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FIONA CARTER | Chair | 16 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Helen Pratley Wright | Trustee | 13 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR DAVID JAMES | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN ANDREW EATON | Trustee | 16 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.23k | £10.53k | £28.01k | £31.09k | £26.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.77k | £7.22k | £17.83k | £25.27k | £34.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £1.85k | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £1.85k | £1.00k | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 10 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 10 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Sep 2017 as amended on 18 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE NEED AND PROMOTE HEALTH FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 12 AND 18 YEARS, LIVING IN GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND WORCESTERSHIRE, WHO CANNOT ADEQUATELY ACCESS AND PARTICIPATE IN SPORT THROUGH LACK OF FUNDING, BY PROVIDING THEM WITH GRANTS FOR THE ACQUISITION OF ESSENTIAL SPORTING EQUIPMENT AND COACHING AND TO PROVIDE THEM WITH MENTORING SUPPORT WHERE NECESSARY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Paradigm Norton
Paradigm House
72-74 Macrae Road
Pill
BRISTOL
BS20 0DD
- Phone:
- 07776144728
- Email:
- fiona@cassandfriends.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window