LIFE CHURCH SOUTH MANSFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Christian Church. We hold Christian services every week. Our congregation has a high proportion of children, elderly and vulnerable adults and we help to care for them on a practical, emotional and spiritual level. We donate money to various Christian charities at home and abroad including relief organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 05 February 1980: Standard registration
- LIFE Church - Mansfield, Nottinghamshire (Working name)
- S M C F (Previous name)
- THE CHURCH IN THE CENTRE (Previous name)
- THE SOUTH MANSFIELD CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Hurd | Chair | 15 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Simon Hurrell | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Lesley Eleanor Dannatt | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jo Gregg | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Marie Hillman | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.73k | £32.03k | £31.85k | £33.49k | £42.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.57k | £32.50k | £23.66k | £30.18k | £42.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £200 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 November 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 November 2024 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 August 2024 | 289 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 August 2024 | 289 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 January 2023 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 January 2023 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 January 2022 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 January 2022 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 December 2020 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 December 2020 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/11/1979 AS AMENDED ON 14/03/1984 AS AMENDED ON 06/02/1986 AS AMENDED ON 07/06/1990 AS AMENDED ON 23/04/1998 AS AMENDED ON 13/09/2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Wingfield Road
MANSFIELD
Nottinghamshire
NG18 3HT
- Phone:
- 07514538412
- Email:
- jacquie.cooper@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window