CANOLFAN CYMDEITHAS GERLAN A R'CYLCH GERLAN COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a community centre in the village of Gerlan providing a space for people to meet and hold community activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gwynedd
Governance
- 22 February 1980: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Einir Williams | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Llinos Parry | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heledd Selwyn | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
JANE JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIC ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CARYS DAFYDD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAFYDD FON WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.53k | £24.55k | £2.51k | £4.09k | £3.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.43k | £3.85k | £4.25k | £4.75k | £5.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 February 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 MAY 1979
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF GERLAN AND ITS VICINITIES IN THE COUNTY OF GWYNEDD (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AD CLASSES AND FOR INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
GERLAN AND ITS VICINITIES GERLAN A'R CYLCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 GERLAN ROAD
GERLAN
BETHESDA
BANGOR
LL57 3ST
- Phone:
- 01248602509
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window