ABOVE & BEYOND CANCER FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offering support to people, their carers, or family members who have been diagnosed with cancer. Provide a safe place for those to chat and talk through their experience. Provide access to complementary and holistic therapies, should they feel that this will aid in their wellbeing during this time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 27 July 2017: CIO registration
- ABOVE & BEYOND (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Thursfield | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
JAYNE PROCTOR | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
LIZ ROE | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
JULIE MORRISON | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Karen Chin | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.92k | £39.17k | £34.89k | £62.31k | £70.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.34k | £20.45k | £37.39k | £50.67k | £66.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 15 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 15 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 24 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Jul 2017 as amended on 12 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
To promote and protect good health for the public benefit, for those persons living with or affected by cancer by; a) offering 1 to 1 support in which people with a cancer diagnosis, their carers and family members can exchange a shared experience and b) provide practical advice and support including access to complimentary therapies, including but not exclusively limited to reflexology, reiki, massage and relaxation techniques.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 The Rowlands
BIGGLESWADE
SG18 8NY
- Phone:
- 07812008103
- Email:
- karenchin68@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window