GIRLGUIDING WEST YORKSHIRE SOUTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of WYSGGA (now known as Girlguiding West Yorkshire South) are to develop, promote and advance guiding. They follow the objectives of the Guide Association Viz to: (1) Create opportunities for more girls and adults to be part of Girlguiding UK. (2) Sustain an enjoyable and challenging programme of activities based on the guiding method. (3) Enable and encourage all members to partici
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
1000 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
Governance
- 01 April 1980: Standard registration
- GIRLGUIDING WEST YORKSHIRE SOUTH (Working name)
- WEST YORKSHIRE SOUTH GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Mary Robinson | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Slater | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fay Newsome | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE BREEZE | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Laura Breeze | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Brown | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Rhodes | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Ellen Lisa Haydock | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Coulson | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Louise Bagnall | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Margaret Pearson | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katie McGee | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN LONGBOTTOM | Trustee | 07 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Barker | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sally Jane Collinson | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.79k | £40.40k | £26.83k | £28.66k | £36.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.26k | £25.92k | £29.01k | £32.04k | £48.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 November 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 November 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 November 2022 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 14 DECEMBER 1922
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF GIRLS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Sandpiper Court
Calder Grove
Wakefield
WF4 3FF
- Phone:
- 07711284233
- Website:
-
girlguidingwestyorkshiresouth.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window