CARNAVAL DEL PUEBLO ASOCIACIÓN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the Public benefit, to promote, improve and advance education in, and appreciation of, the Arts (meaning the Musical, Visual, Dramatic or any other Arts provided in each case that they are of recognised Cultural or Educational value), in particular by staging events to celebrate, promote and develop a greater understanding of Latin American Culture.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £46,600 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Southwark
Governance
- 20 July 2017: CIO registration
- CARNAVAL DEL PUEBLO ASOCIACI¾N (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHIARA STELLA COCHETTI | Chair | 20 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elder Sanchez | Trustee | 14 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Oluyinka | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robin Bunce | Trustee | 30 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
PEDRO ALEJANDRO GIL-QUINTERO | Trustee | 20 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.10k | £41.28k | £31.86k | £71.03k | £87.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £458 | £33.87k | £28.65k | £90.87k | £98.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £42.40k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.00k | £31.86k | N/A | £46.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 July 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 July 2024 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 January 2024 | 208 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 January 2024 | 208 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 13 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 06 November 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Jul 2017
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ARTS (MEANING THE MUSICAL, VISUAL, DRAMATIC OR ANY OTHER ARTS PROVIDED IN EACH CASE THAT THEY ARE OF RECOGNISED CULTURAL OR EDUCATIONAL VALUE), IN PARTICULAR BY STAGING EVENTS TO CELEBRATE, PROMOTE AND DEVELOP A GREATER UNDERSTANDING OF LATIN AMERICAN CULTURE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Peckam Levels
95 Rye Lane
Unit 221B
Peckham
London
- Phone:
- 07534896423
- Email:
- nualacdp@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window