Financial history LLANFIHANGEL RECREATION ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1171945
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 19/04/2020 19/04/2021 19/04/2022 19/04/2023 19/04/2024
Total gross income £8.93k £15.62k £60.60k £344.43k £23.25k
Total expenditure £5.02k £7.79k £59.77k £354.78k £21.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £14.50k £500 N/A £1.00k