FRIENDS OF MARCH RAILWAY STATION (FOMRS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends Of March Railway Station (FOMRS) is a group of community volunteers who wish to make the station a vibrant and attractive place to visit and use, both for the those using the railways and for the community. The group also sets out to preserve the heritage of March Station and the History of the Railways influence in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 28 April 2017: CIO registration
- FOMRS (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF MARCH RAILWAY STATION (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF MARCH RAILWAY STATION (FORMS) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Abel | Chair | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Ward | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Christy | Trustee | 30 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
GARY JOHN CHRISTY | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.44k | £1.06k | £0 | £968 | £3.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £782 | £1.71k | £551 | £752 | £1.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £400 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 28 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF BUILDING ASSOCIATED WITH THE HISTORY OF RAILWAYS IN MARCH BY; (A) PROVIDING RESOURCES FOR LEARNING ABOUT THE HISTORY OF AND THE ROLE THE RAILWAY HAS PLAYED IN DEVELOPMENT OF THE TOWN AND (B) PROMOTING THE HISTORIC IMPORTANCE OF THE HERITAGE OF RAILWAYS IN MARCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
75 WIMBLINGTON ROAD
MARCH
PE15 9QW
- Phone:
- 01354653045
- Email:
- gary@christy.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window