RIDING FOR SMILES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RfS offers inclusive, innovative equestrian based activities to disabled and vulnerable young people who have physical, social, learning, behavioural and mental disabilities and those who are disaffected, excluded or marginalised. Our sessions provide enjoyable, enrichment experiences to develop confidence and self-esteem, positive interaction, motivation, calmness, thoughtfulness and resilience.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
- Nottinghamshire
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 21 September 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Addis | Chair | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Beth Stuckey | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
SHARON TOLLEY | Trustee | 28 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
HELEN STUCKEY | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.44k | £52.01k | £64.26k | £47.32k | £102.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.35k | £13.82k | £55.27k | £58.38k | £113.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.00k | £1.50k | £1.00k | £14.95k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Sep 2017
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH, RELIEF OF NEED AND ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE A PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISABILITY OR DISABILITIES, OR WHO ARE IN NEED OF RELIEF FROM HURT AND PAIN BY THE PROVISION OF A RANGE OF ACTIVITIES TO CREATE OPPORTUNITIES FOR RELIEF AND DEVELOPMENT WITHIN AN EQUESTRIAN ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BANK HOUSE FARM
MANSFIELD ROAD
CRESWELL
WORKSOP
S80 4AA
- Phone:
- 01909725251
- Email:
- Sales@colouredcob.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window