JAWAAB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
f
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 May 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MILAD AHMED | Chair | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
RUKAIYA JERAJ | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
DULAL ALI | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 265 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 265 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 20 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 20 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 May 2017
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF ETHNIC MINORITY COMMUNITIES OR REFUGEES AGED 18-35 IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS:- 1)TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THESE INDIVIDUALS AND RELEVANT GROUPS IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY THROUGH RESEARCH, EDUCATION AND TRAINING; AND 2)TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FINFUTURE LTD
225-229 SEVEN SISTERS ROAD
LONDON
N4 2DA
- Phone:
- 07876503964
- Email:
- info@jawaab.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window