PENYSARN VILLAGE HALL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Hall erected in memory of the men who fell in the Great War and to be used in perpetuity under the name of Penysarn Village Hall as a Reading Room for meetings of purely parochial matters but not for any denominational or political purposes whatsoever and otherwise for the benefits of the inhabitants of the parishes of Llaneilian and Llanwenllwyfo and the district of Penysarn.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Isle Of Anglesey
Governance
- 28 February 1980: Standard registration
- 06 May 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 06 May 2025: Funds transferred to 1203065 NEUADD PENTREF PENYSARN
- PENYSARN COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.73k | £13.40k | £1.25k | £4.52k | £15.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.84k | £6.38k | £3.55k | £16.68k | £29.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 February 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 February 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 DECEMBER 1925, AS AMENDED BY THE CHARITABLE TRUSTS (VALIDATION) ACT 1954.
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF A READING ROOM FOR MEETINGS OF PURELY PAROCHIAL MATTERS BUT NOT FOR ANY DENOMINATIONAL OR POLITICAL PURPOSES WHATSOEVER AND OTHERWISE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE SAID PARISHES OF LLANEILIAN AND LLANWENLLWYFO AND PENYSARN DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF LLANEILIAN, LLANWENLLWYFO AND PENYSARN DISTRICT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window