MANCHESTER RUGBY UNION DEVELOPMENT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote amateur sport by supporting schools, universities, colleges and clubs with coaching, equipment and organizing tournaments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £18,750 from 3 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 08 February 2017: CIO registration
- MRUDG (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lloyd Smale | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicky Boothroyd | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Smail | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.00k | £34.99k | £33.42k | £21.28k | £19.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.88k | £43.52k | £45.78k | £22.22k | £35.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £9.25k | N/A | £31.91k | N/A | £18.75k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 June 2022 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 01 June 2022 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 07 May 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 07 May 2021 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE MRUDG IS THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, COACHING, COMPETITIONS AND SIMILAR ACTIVITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF AMATEUR RUGBY UNION AT SCHOOLS, UNIVERSITIES, COLLEGES AND CLUBS WITHIN GREATER MANCHESTER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 BAMFORD GROVE
MANCHESTER
M20 2FF
- Phone:
- 07843942029
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window