Financial history PURPLE HEART WISHES

Charity number: 1171534
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.82k £1.43k £15.26k £47.14k £89.09k
Total expenditure £15.82k £1.06k £15.71k £56.46k £73.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A