PURPLE HEART WISHES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We grant wishes for people diagnosed with a terminal illness in their early adult life. Hoping to give as many happy memories as possible to them, and their family and friends
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 February 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN PATRICIA ROUGHTON MAW | Chair | 09 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
NEIL FAGLEMAN | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
JORDAN STREET | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jones | Trustee | 06 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Irram Kaleem | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET POWELL | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
JILL BARBARA KIRKHAM MINST CERT | Trustee | 09 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
SEAN ANTHONY TITLEY BSC | Trustee | 02 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
GARY BRYAN HAMMOND | Trustee | 02 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
TONI BERNADETTE KEMP | Trustee | 02 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.82k | £1.43k | £15.26k | £47.14k | £89.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.82k | £1.06k | £15.71k | £56.46k | £73.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Feb 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE ADULT PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM SERIOUS OR TERMINAL ILLNESS BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT; IN PARTICULAR, THOUGH NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY ENABLING THE REALISATION OF DREAMS AND WISHES OF SAID PATIENTS TO CREATE SPECIAL MEMORIES FOR THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
71 Middle Mead
CIRENCESTER
Gloucestershire
GL7 1GX
- Phone:
- 07442087660
- Email:
- hello@purpleheartwishes.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window