THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF HACKNEY CARRIAGE DRIVERS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds for the Magical Taxi Tour for children with life threatening illnesses. To give benevolence to Licensed Taxi drivers and their families, Support City of London based charities and nominated projects in London
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
- Kent
- Surrey
- Thurrock
- Throughout London
Governance
- 07 April 2017: CIO registration
- 11 June 2018: Funds received from 1026395 THE HACKNEY CARRIAGE DRIVERS CHARITY TRUST
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL DAVIES | Chair | 07 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Mary Elizabeth Whitworth | Trustee | 02 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||
Steven Leslie Wright | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|||||||||||
Silverio Philip Oliveira | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Daniel Mark Heath | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
PETER JOHN SVERRE JOHANSEN MBE | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
WENDY SORRELL | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
PHILLIP JOHN DAVIS MBE | Trustee | 07 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £237.14k | £72.70k | £43.71k | £291.16k | £433.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £215.55k | £48.99k | £41.86k | £332.31k | £389.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Apr 2017 as amended on 28 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (AS ARE CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY: A) MAKING GRANTS, AWARDS AND DONATIONS TO ANY CHARITY INCLUDING: THE NOMINATED CHARITY OF THE LORD MAYOR OF LONDON; B) SUPPORTING THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE COMPANY'S AFFILIATED SCHOOL, ITS AFFILIATED MILITARY UNIT AND BY UNDERTAKING THE CHARITABLE MAGICAL TAXI TOUR; AND C) RELIEVING THOSE LONDON LICENSED TAXI DRIVERS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS, AWARDS AND DONATIONS FOR THEIR BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHCD CHARITY TRUST
PO BOX 2113
CHIGWELL
IG7 6BP
- Phone:
- 02082819320
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window