CARDIFF LIONS CLUB TRUST FUND

Charity number: 509701
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO PROVIDE HELP TO THOSE IN NEED BY DIRECT SERVICE OR BY RAISING MONEY TO FURTHER THAT OBJECTIVE, MAINLY TO THOSE IN CARDIFF OR THROUGH CONTRIBUTIONS TO THE LIONS INTERNATIONAL TRUST FOR NATIONAL PROJECTS OR FOR HELP IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £2,996
Total expenditure: £3,186

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Cardiff

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 February 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE CARDIFF LIONS CLUB (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephen Allan Blacker Trustee 07 September 2023
None on record
MARTYN HUGH WILLIAMS Trustee
None on record
HARRY LESLIE WEST Trustee
None on record
ANTHONY RODERIC HILL Trustee
THE EVA SELINE FUND
Received: On time
THE WELSH ASSOCIATION OF YOUTH CLUBS
Received: On time
STEVEN HARRIS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.05k £116 £868 £2.99k £3.00k
Total expenditure £1.03k £1.74k £2.45k £1.04k £3.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 23 June 2024 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 08 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 20 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 21 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 St. Francis Road
Cardiff
CF14 1AW
Phone:
03458336748