Financial history THE ORCHARD FOOD BANK

Charity Number: 1172151
Charity reporting is up to date (20 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £575 £9.13k £8.36k £2.87k £11.60k
Total expenditure £0 £6.41k £7.91k £5.26k £4.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A