THE ORCHARD FOOD BANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operates a food bank in South Liverpool
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 20 March 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Hay | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE LESLEY FULLER | Trustee | 16 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £575 | £9.13k | £8.36k | £2.87k | £11.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £6.41k | £7.91k | £5.26k | £4.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 20 December 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 20 December 2024 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 16 December 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 16 December 2020 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Mar 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE GARSTON AREA OF SOUTH LIVERPOOL THROUGH THE OPERATION OF A FOOD BANK TO PROVIDE EMERGENCY FOOD SUPPLIES AND RELATED SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE BEEN IDENTIFIED AS HAVING A FINANCIAL NEED. INITIALLY WE WILL BE RELYING ON MATERIAL DONATIONS FROM LOCAL SUPPLIERS WHO HAVE AGREED TO COMMIT TO ACHIEVING OUR OBJECTIVES. THE ORCHARD WILL RECEIVE SOME FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FROM THE RESOURCE DEVELOPMENT CENTRE LTD TO COVER START-UP COSTS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Woodville Accountancy
Unit 20B
Yarrow Mill
Yarrow Road
CHORLEY
Lancashi
- Phone:
- 01512077744
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window