BRANDON HOUSE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Letting and operating of Conference and Exhibition Centre and letting and operating real estate
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£523,984
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £523.98k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£83,328
Raising funds | £83.33k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £83.33k | |
Charitable expenditure | £0 | |
Retained for future use | £440.66k |
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 April 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ghanshyam Ramparia | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|||
MR Jitendrakumar Patel | Trustee | 22 April 2017 |
|
|||
Mr K Bhattessa | Trustee | 22 April 2017 |
|
|||
Dr Mayank Ramanlal Shah | Trustee | 22 April 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £378.64k | £271.06k | £266.67k | £7.60m | £523.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £373.21k | £273.40k | £39.98k | £49.04k | £83.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.20m | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £400.00k | £523.98k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £49.04k | £83.33k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.67m | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £16.00m | £17.66m | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.64m | £808.58k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.30m | £7.01m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 November 2023 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE THE AKSHAR PURUSHOTTAM SWAMINARAYAN DENOMINATION OF THE HINDU RELIGION BASED UPON THE TEACHINGS AND PRINCIPLES OF BHAGWAN SWAMINARAYAN; AND TO FOSTER THE PRACTICE AND WORSHIP OF THE AKSHAR PURUSHOTTAM SWAMINARAYAN DENOMINATION OF THE HINDU RELIGION AS REVEALED BY BHAGWAN SWAMINARAYAN. THESE VEDIC TEACHINGS AND PRINCIPLES, BASED ON THE BRAHMA SUTRAS, UPANISHADS AND BHAGAVAD GITA, AS WELL AS OTHER FOUNDATIONAL HINDU SCRIPTURES, ARE COLLECTIVELY KNOWN AS SWAMINARAYAN DARSHAN OR AKSHAR PURUSHOTTAM UPASANA Û THAT IS, WORSHIPPING BHAGWAN SWAMINARAYAN AS PURNA PURUSHOTTAM NARAYAN (THE SUPREME AND ONE GOD) BY PURIFYING ONESELF AND BECOMING ONE WITH GUNATITANAND SWAMI AS AKSHARBRAHMAN (GODÆS ETERNAL ABODE), ALSO KNOWN AS BRAHMARUP, THROUGH THE ASSOCIATION OF THE CURRENT BRAHMASWARUP GURU. AKSHAR PURUSHOTTAM UPASANA IS FURTHER BASED ON THE FOUR PRINCIPLES OF EKANTIK DHARMA (NAMELY DHARMA, GNAN, VAIRAGYA AND BHAKTI) AND ITS TEACHINGS ARE PROPAGATED AND ENUNCIATED BY THE SPIRITUAL SUCCESSORS OF BHAGWAN SWAMINARAYAN, NAMELY AKSHARBRAHMAN GUNATITANAND SWAMI, SHRI PRAGJI BHAKTA (ALSO KNOWN AS BHAGATJI MAHARAJ), SHASTRI YAGNAPURUSHDAS (ALSO KNOWN AS SHASTRIJI MAHARAJ), SWAMI GNANJIVANDAS (ALSO KNOWN AS YOGIJI MAHARAJ), SHASTRI NARAYANSWARUPDAS (PRESENT SPIRITUAL HEAD, ALSO KNOWN AS PRAMUKH SWAMI MAHARAJ) AND HIS DIRECT SUCCESSOR AS SELECTED BY SHASTRI NARAYANSWARUPDAS AND THOSE DIRECT SUCCESSORS SELECTED IN THIS MANNER THEREAFTER. THE TRUSTEES SHALL PROCURE THAT THE CHARITY FOLLOWS THE TEACHINGS AND PRINCIPLES OF THE SPIRITUAL LEADER OF BOCHASANWASI SHRI AKSHAR PURUSHOTTAM SWAMINARAYAN SANSTHA OF BOCHASAN, DISTRICT KARIA, GUJARAT STATE, INDIA, AND ITS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST, REGISTERED IN INDIA UNDER THE BOMBAY PUBLIC TRUSTS ACT 1950 AND PUBLIC TRUST REGISTRATION NO. A/2500/AMDAVAD (HEREINAFTER ÔBAPS INDIA Ö). IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OUTLINED ABOVE, THE CHARITY MAY: (1) PROVIDE RELIEF TO PERSONS WHETHER OR NOT THEY ARE RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AS A RESULT OF LOCAL, NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL DISASTER OR BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES; (2) PRESERVE AND SAFEGUARD THE HEALTH OF ALL PERSONS AND IN PARTICULAR OF YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE IN DANGER OF BECOMING ADDICTED TO OR DEPENDENT UPON ILLEGAL DRUGS OF ANY DESCRIPTION, ALCOHOL, SOLVENTS OR OTHER ADDICTIVE SUBSTANCES; (3) ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; (4) PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION SO AS TO DEVELOP PARTICIPANTSÆ PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES; AND (5) FOR THOSE PURPOSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, TO ALLOW OTHER CHARITIES HAVING SIMILAR OBJECTS TO OCCUPY ANY OF ITS PREMISES AT NIL OR NOMINAL RENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Baps Shri Swaminarayan Mandir
1 Pramukh Swami Road
LONDON
NW10 8HW
- Phone:
- 02089652651
- Email:
- info@brandonhouse.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window