Financial history DONCASTER FOSTER CARERS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1172954
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £32.62k £19.19k £29.25k £23.00k £21.57k
Total expenditure £29.16k £21.39k £26.58k £17.07k £12.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £16.33k £10.11k