Financial history MELLON EDUCATE (UK)

Charity Number: 1175352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £580.90k £116.02k £659.46k £1.01m £607.76k
Total expenditure £428.10k £238.60k £585.48k £964.02k £522.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £277.13k N/A £659.46k £1.01m £607.76k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £303.76k N/A £0 £0 £607.76k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £5.48k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £179.64k N/A £477.81k £807.55k £374.86k
Expenditure - Raising funds £248.45k N/A £107.67k £156.47k £147.94k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £179.64k N/A £477.81k £807.55k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0