MOORLANDS CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The church holds a wide range of meetings and events on Sundays and throughout the week for its members, their families and all who are interested in exploring the Christian faith. All the activities uphold and adhere to the Basis of Faith, doctrinal distinctives and ethical statements of the church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- MOORLANDS CHURCH (Working name)
- MOORLANDS EVANGELICAL CHURCH TRUST (OLD NAME) (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIEL ALEXANDER RURLANDER | Chair | 09 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joel Mark Higson | Trustee | 04 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Philip Weston | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gareth David Watts | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Thomas Orford | Trustee | 02 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £512.42k | £409.02k | £635.27k | £634.03k | £450.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £304.45k | £271.03k | £255.10k | £272.19k | £286.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | N/A | £633.31k | £632.53k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | £1.96k | £1.50k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £512.42k | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £304.45k | N/A | £255.10k | £272.19k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.49k | N/A | £1.85k | £3.19k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £6.85k | N/A | £11.36k | £10.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 15 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
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
Contact information
- Address:
-
HALTON GREEN WEST
HALTON
LANCASTER
LA2 6PA
- Phone:
- 07775724263
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window