Accounts and annual returns ROCKS PARK FRIENDS OF SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1172016
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 27 August 2024 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 11 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 08 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 November 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required