NEWHAM NORTH LEARNING PARTNERSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Newham North has the 5th highest rate of child poverty in London and the lowest life expectancy and the highest rate of heart disease of all London Boroughs. The Newham North Learning Partnership is a small charity set up to try and tackle these problems at their root, by helping fund and support early intervention projects within the Community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Newham
Governance
- 15 February 2017: Standard registration
- 22 July 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.88k | £31.97k | £15.17k | £15.06k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.76k | £32.19k | £13.52k | £17.66k | £17.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S PURPOSES AS SET OUT IN THE OBJECTS CONTAINED IN THE COMPANYÆS MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION WOULD BE: TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN NEWHAM AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO: (A) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND TRAINING; (B) PROMOTING CIVIC RESPONSIBILITY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP; (C) ADVANCING COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION; (D) PROMOTING RACIAL HARMONY; (E) PROMOTING AND PRESERVING GOOD HEALTH; (F) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (G) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT I.E. ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; AND BY (H) PROMOTING THE SOCIAL INCLUSION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY PREVENTING THEM FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF THEIR YOUTH AND/OR BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIAL AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY.Ö THE CHARITY WILL ACHIEVE THIS THROUGH THE RAISING AND ADMINISTERING OF FUNDS AND DELIVERING OF SUPPORT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF THE LOCAL ORGANISATIONS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window